Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/31/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/31/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/01/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/01/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/15/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/04/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/27/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 10/27/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/27/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/01/2011