Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 06/01/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 06/01/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/02/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/02/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 06/02/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 06/02/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/02/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 06/02/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/02/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/02/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/02/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 06/02/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 06/02/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/02/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/02/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/02/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/02/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 06/02/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/02/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 06/02/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 06/02/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/02/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/16/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/16/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/16/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/16/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/16/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 06/16/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 06/16/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/16/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/16/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/16/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/16/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/16/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 06/16/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/16/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 06/16/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/16/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/21/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/21/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 10/27/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/14/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 11/14/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/14/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/14/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 11/16/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/16/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/17/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 11/17/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 11/17/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 11/17/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 11/17/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/17/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 11/17/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/30/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 12/01/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 12/19/2011