Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/01/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 06/01/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/03/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/03/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/22/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/29/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/09/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/31/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 11/15/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/29/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 12/13/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 12/13/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/21/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/27/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/05/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 04/16/2012