Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 06/01/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/02/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/09/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 06/23/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/06/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/07/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/15/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/15/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 08/02/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/13/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/14/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/19/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 10/05/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/21/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 10/25/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 11/03/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/03/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 11/15/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 11/29/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 12/05/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 12/19/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 12/19/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 12/20/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/10/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/17/2012
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 02/13/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 02/13/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 02/29/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 02/29/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/29/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/29/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 03/05/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/05/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/05/2012
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/05/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/27/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/18/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/23/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/09/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/10/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/15/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/16/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/17/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/18/2012
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/29/2012
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/31/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/01/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/05/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/05/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/06/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 06/06/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 06/08/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/19/2012
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/25/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/25/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 06/26/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/26/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 07/09/2012
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/24/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 07/24/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 07/24/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/24/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 08/02/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 08/02/2012
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 08/02/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/13/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 09/13/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/13/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/13/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 09/13/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/13/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 09/13/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/13/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/13/2012
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 09/14/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/14/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/09/2012