Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/02/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/02/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/02/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/14/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/14/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/14/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/14/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/06/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/07/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/11/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/15/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/08/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/08/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 10/06/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/06/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 10/06/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/24/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 10/24/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/24/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 10/24/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/24/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/24/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/01/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/01/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/01/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/14/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 11/14/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/14/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/25/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 01/17/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/17/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/09/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/09/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 02/15/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/15/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/27/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/27/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 03/27/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/09/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 08/02/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/26/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 12/05/2012