Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/06/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/06/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/06/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/06/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/18/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/21/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/26/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 08/01/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/22/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/17/2012