Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 06/02/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/14/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/20/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/21/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/23/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/23/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/07/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/07/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/07/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/08/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/21/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 07/26/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 07/28/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/14/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 10/25/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 11/01/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 11/18/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 05/15/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 07/18/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 07/18/2012