Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/06/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/06/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/06/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/26/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/12/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/12/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/15/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/15/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/20/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/16/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/16/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/16/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/16/2012