Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/06/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 01/06/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 01/06/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 01/06/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 01/06/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 01/06/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/06/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 01/06/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 01/07/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 01/07/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 01/07/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/07/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 01/07/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 01/07/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 01/11/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 01/11/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/12/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 01/12/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/12/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/12/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 01/18/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 01/18/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 01/18/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 01/19/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 01/19/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 01/20/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 01/24/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 01/26/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/26/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 01/26/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 01/26/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/26/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 02/08/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/08/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/09/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 02/09/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/10/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/14/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/17/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/30/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 05/24/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/03/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 06/22/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 07/06/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/25/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/29/2012