Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/17/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/17/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/17/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/17/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/17/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/17/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/17/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/07/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/07/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/14/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/14/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/14/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 04/14/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/14/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/15/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/15/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/15/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/15/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/15/2011
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/05/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/05/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/16/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/16/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/16/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/16/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/16/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/16/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/16/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/16/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 06/16/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/16/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/08/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/08/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/08/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/08/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/08/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/08/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/08/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/14/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/14/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/14/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/14/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/14/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 07/14/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/14/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/25/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/25/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 07/25/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 09/09/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/09/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/09/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/09/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/09/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/09/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/15/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/15/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/22/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/22/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/22/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/22/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/22/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 09/22/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/22/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/22/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/05/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/05/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/05/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/05/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/05/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 10/13/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/27/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/04/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/04/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/04/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 11/04/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 12/02/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 12/07/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/07/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/07/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/07/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/07/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 12/13/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/14/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/14/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/20/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 12/20/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/07/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 02/17/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/17/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/28/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/22/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/22/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/22/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/11/2012
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/11/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/25/2012