Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/15/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/21/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/07/2012
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/18/2012