Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 06/02/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/02/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/16/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/07/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/07/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/26/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/16/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/27/2012