Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 08/16/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 08/16/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 08/16/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 08/16/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 08/16/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 08/16/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 08/16/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 08/16/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 08/16/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 08/16/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 08/16/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 08/16/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 08/16/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 08/16/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 08/16/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 08/16/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 08/16/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 08/23/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 08/23/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 08/23/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 08/23/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 08/30/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 08/30/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/02/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/02/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/09/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/09/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/15/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 09/15/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/15/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/15/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/21/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 09/23/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/24/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/13/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/06/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/06/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 02/06/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/07/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/07/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/07/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 02/14/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/14/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/14/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 02/14/2012
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 03/01/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/01/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/01/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 03/01/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/06/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/06/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/06/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 03/06/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/06/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/07/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/07/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/16/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/21/2012
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/26/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/26/2012
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/29/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/07/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/07/2012
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/07/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 05/07/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 09/10/2012