Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/14/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/14/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/14/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 06/14/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/14/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/14/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/14/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/14/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 06/14/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 06/14/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/14/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 06/14/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/14/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/14/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/14/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/14/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/14/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/21/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/21/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/21/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/21/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/21/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/21/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/21/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/21/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/21/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/21/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/21/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/21/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/01/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/01/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/01/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 07/01/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/01/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/01/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 07/01/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/01/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 07/01/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 07/01/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/01/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/01/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/01/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/01/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/01/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 07/14/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/14/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 07/14/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/14/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/14/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/14/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/14/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/14/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 07/14/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 07/14/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/22/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/22/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/22/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/22/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/22/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/22/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/22/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/22/2011