Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/07/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/07/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/07/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 01/07/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 01/12/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 01/12/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 01/12/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 01/20/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/20/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/20/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 01/20/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 01/25/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 11/02/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 03/28/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 09/21/2012