Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 08/16/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/12/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/29/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/14/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/24/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/01/2011