Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/15/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/16/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/21/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/21/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/06/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/07/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/13/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 07/14/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/19/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/27/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/07/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/15/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/20/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/29/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/29/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/29/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/05/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/14/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/14/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 11/04/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/06/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/12/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/12/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 01/17/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 03/07/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/16/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/17/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/16/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/07/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/18/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/19/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/10/2012