Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/24/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/08/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/22/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/29/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/07/2012