Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/07/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 09/07/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/07/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/07/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/07/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/22/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/22/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 09/22/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/29/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/29/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/03/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/04/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/05/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/05/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 10/07/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/07/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/07/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 10/11/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/11/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/14/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 10/14/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 10/14/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/24/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/24/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/24/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 10/24/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 10/24/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/24/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 10/26/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/26/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/26/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 11/01/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/01/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 11/01/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 11/02/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/02/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 11/02/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/02/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 11/04/2011
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 11/04/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/15/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/15/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 11/15/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/17/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 11/17/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 11/17/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 11/17/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/17/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/17/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/17/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/16/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 12/16/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 12/16/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/06/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/27/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/27/2012