Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 06/03/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/20/2011
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 09/07/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/09/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 09/09/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 09/09/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 10/03/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/11/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 11/02/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/02/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/17/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 11/30/2011