Text: H.R.2139 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-181 (10/05/2012)

 
[112th Congress Public Law 181]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]



[[Page 1415]]

   LIONS CLUBS INTERNATIONAL CENTURY OF SERVICE COMMEMORATIVE COIN ACT

[[Page 126 STAT. 1416]]

Public Law 112-181
112th Congress

                                 An Act


 
To require the Secretary of the Treasury to mint coins in commemoration 
         of the centennial of the establishment of Lions Clubs 
          International. <<NOTE: Oct. 5, 2012 -  [H.R. 2139]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled, <<NOTE: Lions Clubs 
International Century of Service Commemorative Coin Act. 31 USC 5112 
note.>> 
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Lions Clubs International Century of 
Service Commemorative Coin Act''.
SEC. 2. FINDINGS.

    The Congress finds as follows:
            (1) <<NOTE: Melvin Jones.>> Lions Clubs International is the 
        world's largest service club organization founded in 1917 by 
        Chicago business leader Melvin Jones. Lions Clubs International 
        empowers volunteers to serve their communities, meet 
        humanitarian needs, encourage peace and promote international 
        understanding through Lions clubs.
            (2) Today, Lions Clubs International has over 1.35 million 
        members in more than 45,000 clubs globally, extending its 
        mission of service throughout the world every day.
            (3) In 1945, Lions Clubs International became one of the 
        first nongovernmental organizations invited to assist in 
        drafting the United Nations Charter and has enjoyed a special 
        relationship with the United Nations ever since.
            (4) In 1968, Lions Clubs International Foundation was 
        established to assist with global and large-scale local 
        humanitarian projects and has since then awarded more than $700 
        million to fund five unique areas of service: preserving sight, 
        combating disability, promoting health, serving youth and 
        providing disaster relief.
            (5) In 1990, the Lions Clubs International Foundation 
        launched the SightFirst program to build comprehensive eye care 
        systems to fight the major causes of blindness and care for the 
        blind or visually impaired. Thanks to the generosity of Lions 
        worldwide, over $415 million has been raised, resulting in the 
        prevention of serious vision loss in 30 million people and 
        improved eye care for hundreds of millions of people.
            (6) On June 7, 2017, Lions Clubs International will 
        celebrate 100 years of community service to men, women, and 
        children in need throughout the world.
SEC. 3. COIN SPECIFICATIONS.

    (a) $1 Silver Coins.--The Secretary of the Treasury (hereafter in 
this Act referred to as the ``Secretary'') shall mint and issue

[[Page 126 STAT. 1417]]

not more than 400,000 $1 coins in commemoration of the centennial of the 
founding of the Lions Clubs International, each of which shall--
            (1) weigh 26.73 grams;
            (2) have a diameter of 1.500 inches; and
            (3) contain 90 percent silver and 10 percent copper.

    (b) Legal Tender.--The coins minted under this Act shall be legal 
tender, as provided in section 5103 of title 31, United States Code.
    (c) Numismatic Items.--For purposes of sections 5134 and 5136 of 
title 31, United States Code, all coins minted under this Act shall be 
considered to be numismatic items.
SEC. 4. DESIGN OF COINS.

    (a) Design Requirements.--
            (1) In general.--The design of the coins minted under this 
        Act shall be emblematic of the centennial of the Lions Clubs 
        International.
            (2) Designation and inscriptions.--On each coin minted under 
        this Act, there shall be--
                    (A) a designation of the value of the coin;
                    (B) an inscription of the year ``2017''; and
                    (C) inscriptions of the words ``Liberty'', ``In God 
                We Trust'', ``United States of America'', and ``E 
                Pluribus Unum''.

    (b) Selection.--The design for the coins minted under this Act shall 
be--
            (1) chosen by the Secretary after consultation with Lions 
        Clubs International Special Centennial Planning Committee and 
        the Commission of Fine Arts; and
            (2) reviewed by the Citizens Coinage Advisory Committee.
SEC. 5. ISSUANCE OF COINS.

    (a) Quality of Coins.--Coins minted under this Act shall be issued 
in uncirculated and proof qualities.
    (b) Mint Facility.--Only one facility of the United States Mint may 
be used to strike any particular quality of the coins minted under this 
Act.
    (c) Period for Issuance.--The Secretary may issue coins under this 
Act only during the calendar year beginning on January 1, 2017.
SEC. 6. SALE OF COINS.

    (a) Sale Price.--The coins issued under this Act shall be sold by 
the Secretary at a price equal to the sum of--
            (1) the face value of the coins;
            (2) the surcharge provided in section 7 with respect to such 
        coins; and
            (3) the cost of designing and issuing the coins (including 
        labor, materials, dies, use of machinery, overhead expenses, 
        marketing, and shipping).

    (b) Bulk Sales.--The Secretary shall make bulk sales of the coins 
issued under this Act at a reasonable discount.
    (c) Prepaid Orders.--
            (1) In general.--The Secretary shall accept prepaid orders 
        for the coins minted under this Act before the issuance of such 
        coins.

[[Page 126 STAT. 1418]]

            (2) Discount.--Sale prices with respect to prepaid orders 
        under paragraph (1) shall be at a reasonable discount.
SEC. 7. SURCHARGES.

    (a) In General.--All sales of coins issued under this Act shall 
include a surcharge of $10 per coin.
    (b) Distribution.--Subject to section 5134(f) of title 31, United 
States Code, all surcharges received by the Secretary from the sale of 
coins issued under this Act shall be promptly paid by the Secretary to 
the Lions Clubs International Foundation for the purposes of--
            (1) furthering its programs for the blind and visually 
        impaired in the United States and abroad;
            (2) investing in adaptive technologies for the disabled; and
            (3) investing in youth and those affected by a major 
        disaster.

    (c) Audits.--The Lions Clubs International Foundation shall be 
subject to the audit requirements of section 5134(f)(2) of title 31, 
United States Code, with regard to the amounts received under subsection 
(b).
    (d) Limitation.--Notwithstanding subsection (a), no surcharge may be 
included with respect to the issuance under this Act of any coin during 
a calendar year if, as of the time of such issuance, the issuance of 
such coin would result in the number of commemorative coin programs 
issued during such year to exceed the annual 2 commemorative coin 
program issuance limitation under section 5112(m)(1) of title 31, United 
States Code. The Secretary may issue guidance to carry out this 
subsection.
SEC. 8. FINANCIAL ASSURANCES.

    The Secretary shall take such actions as may be necessary to ensure 
that--
            (1) minting and issuing coins under this Act will not result 
        in any net cost to the United States Government; and
            (2) no funds, including applicable surcharges, shall be 
        disbursed to any recipient designated in section 7 until the 
        total cost of designing and issuing all of the coins authorized 
        by this Act (including labor, materials, dies, use of machinery, 
        overhead expenses, marketing, and shipping) is recovered by the 
        United States Treasury, consistent with sections 5112(m) and 
        5134(f) of title 31, United States Code.
SEC. 9. BUDGET COMPLIANCE.

    The budgetary effects of this Act, for the purpose of complying with 
the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010, shall be determined by 
reference to the latest statement titled ``Budgetary Effects of PAYGO 
Legislation'' for this Act, submitted for printing in the Congressional 
Record by the Chairman of the Committee on the

[[Page 126 STAT. 1419]]

Budget of the House of Representatives, provided that such statement has 
been submitted prior to the vote on passage.

    Approved October 5, 2012.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 2139 (S. 1299):
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 158 (2012):
            Sept. 10, considered and passed House.
            Sept. 21, considered and passed Senate.

                                  <all>