Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 06/03/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/16/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/23/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/24/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/08/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/08/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 07/08/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/12/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/12/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/14/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/21/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/22/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/25/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/26/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/26/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/26/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/26/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 08/01/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/01/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/12/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/12/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/12/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/20/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/20/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/20/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/21/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/26/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/26/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/18/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/18/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 11/18/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 11/18/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/08/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/08/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/17/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 01/24/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/03/2012
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/07/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/07/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/29/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/09/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/10/2012
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/30/2012
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/31/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/01/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/07/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/15/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/21/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/29/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/09/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/09/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/18/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/23/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 08/01/2012