Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 06/07/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 06/07/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 06/07/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 06/07/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 06/07/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 06/07/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 06/07/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 06/07/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 06/07/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 06/07/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/07/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 06/07/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 06/07/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 06/07/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 06/07/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 06/07/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/14/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 06/23/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/06/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/06/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/12/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/12/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 10/14/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 02/01/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/01/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/01/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/13/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/13/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/13/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/13/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/29/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 02/29/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/09/2012