Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/21/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/21/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/21/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/21/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 06/21/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 06/21/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/22/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/23/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/06/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/20/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/25/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/07/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/14/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/14/2011