Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 09/07/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/20/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/28/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/08/2012