Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/13/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/14/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 06/14/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/14/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/14/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 06/15/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/15/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/15/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/15/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/15/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/22/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/02/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/06/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/08/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/08/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 02/08/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/08/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/08/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/08/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/13/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/13/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/13/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/13/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 02/13/2012
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/14/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/14/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/14/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/14/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/14/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/14/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 02/14/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/15/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 02/15/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 02/15/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 02/28/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/28/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/28/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/28/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/06/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/19/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/19/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/19/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/10/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 05/10/2012
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 05/10/2012