There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 14901 Adelfa Drive in La Mirada, California, as the "Wayne Grisham Post Office".


Actions Overview (2)

Date
12/12/2011Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 353 - 1 (Roll no. 914).(text: CR H8327)
06/13/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
03/14/2012SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
12/13/2011SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
12/12/2011-7:03pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/12/2011-7:03pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 353 - 1 (Roll no. 914). (text: CR H8327)
12/12/2011-6:56pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8340-8341)
12/12/2011-4:48pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/12/2011-4:40pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2158.
12/12/2011-4:40pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8327-8328)
12/12/2011-4:40pmHouseMr. Issa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/03/2011HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
11/03/2011HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/03/2011HouseSubcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy Discharged.
06/20/2011HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy .
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
06/13/2011HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
06/13/2011HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1071)
06/13/2011HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 06/13/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 06/13/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/13/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/14/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 06/14/2011
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 06/14/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/14/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/14/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 06/14/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/14/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/21/2011
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/21/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 06/21/2011
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 06/21/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/21/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 06/21/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/21/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/21/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/21/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 06/21/2011

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform06/13/2011 Referred to
11/03/2011 Markup by
House Oversight and Government Reform Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy06/20/2011 Referred to
11/03/2011 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs12/13/2011 Referred to
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security03/14/2012 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2158.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2158. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/13/2011)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 14901 Adelfa Drive in La Mirada, California, as the "Wayne Grisham Post Office."