There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

PROSTATE Act
Prostate Research, Outreach, Screening, Testing, Access, and Treatment Effectiveness Act of 2011

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reduce disparities and improve access to effective and cost efficient diagnosis and treatment of prostate cancer through advances in testing, research, and education, including through telehealth, comparative effectiveness research, and identification of best practices in patient education and outreach particularly with respect to underserved racial, ethnic and rural populations and men with a family history of prostate cancer, to establish a directive on what constitutes clinically appropriate prostate cancer imaging, and to create a prostate cancer scientific advisory board for the Office of the Chief Scientist at the Food and Drug Administration to accelerate real-time sharing of the latest research and accelerate movement of new medicines to patients.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/14/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
06/24/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/24/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
06/16/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/14/2011Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/14/2011Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/14/2011Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/14/2011Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1082)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/14/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/14/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/14/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/23/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/23/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/23/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/23/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/06/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/14/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/15/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/21/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/28/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/20/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/22/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/23/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/23/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/23/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/05/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/05/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 10/24/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/06/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/19/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/20/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/06/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/06/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/08/2012
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/08/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/19/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/27/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/16/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/02/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/28/2012

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/14/2011 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/16/2011 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs06/14/2011 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health06/24/2011 Referred to
House Armed Services06/14/2011 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel06/24/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2159. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/14/2011)

Prostate Research, Outreach, Screening, Testing, Access, and Treatment Effectiveness Act of 2011 or the PROSTATE Act - Requires the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to establish the Interagency Prostate Cancer Coordination and Education Task Force, with duties to include: (1) developing a summary of advances in federal prostate cancer research and compile a list of best practices that warrant broader adoption in health care programs; (2) considering establishing guidance to enable physicians to allow screening of men over age 74; (3) coordinating information on federal research and health care program activities relating to prostate cancer; and (4) submitting recommendations regarding federal research and health care programs.

Directs the Secretary to establish and carry out a program to coordinate and intensify prostate cancer research, including by developing advances in diagnostic and prognostic methods and tests, better understanding the etiology of the disease, and establishing clinical registries for prostate cancer and awarding research grants.

Establishes in the Office of the Chief Scientist of the Food and Drug Administration (FDA) a Prostate Cancer Scientific Advisory Board to be responsible for accelerating real-time sharing of the latest research data and accelerating movement of new medicines to patients.

Directs the Secretary of VA, the Secretary of Defense (DOD) and the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to establish four-year telehealth pilot projects to analyze the clinical outcomes and cost effectiveness associated with telehealth services in a variety of geographic areas that contain high proportions of medically underserved populations and those in rural areas.

Requires the Secretary of VA to develop a national education campaign for prostate cancer.