Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/14/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/14/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/23/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/23/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/23/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/23/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/06/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/14/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/15/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/21/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/28/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/20/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/22/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/23/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/23/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/23/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/05/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/05/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 10/24/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/06/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/19/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/20/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/06/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/06/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/08/2012
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/08/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/19/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/27/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/16/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/02/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/28/2012