Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/16/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/16/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 06/16/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/21/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/21/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/21/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/21/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/21/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/21/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 06/22/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 06/22/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 06/24/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 07/06/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/06/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/06/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/07/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/07/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/13/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/13/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/13/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/13/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/13/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/13/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/14/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/18/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/18/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/18/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/19/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/19/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/20/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/21/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/25/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/25/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/25/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/25/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/26/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/26/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/27/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/27/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/27/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/28/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/28/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/28/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 07/28/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/07/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/13/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/20/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 11/01/2011