There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Private Company Flexibility and Growth Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Private Company Flexibility and Growth Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 to change the threshold number of shareholders for required registration under that Act.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
12/12/2011Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 112-327.
06/14/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
12/12/2011Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 223.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/12/2011Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 112-327.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
10/26/2011Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
10/26/2011Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
10/05/2011Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Financial Services Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises
10/05/2011Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Financial Services Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises
10/04/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
09/21/2011Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises Prior to Referral.
Action By: House Financial Services Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises
06/14/2011Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/14/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services06/14/2011 Referred to
10/26/2011 Markup by
12/12/2011 Reported by H. Rept. 112-327
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises10/04/2011 Referred to
09/21/2011 Hearings by
10/05/2011 Markup by
10/05/2011 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2167. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (12/12/2011)

Private Company Flexibility and Growth Act - Amends the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 to change the thresholds for total assets and for class of equity security holders of record which trigger the requirement for a securities issuer to register with the Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC). Increases the total assets threshold from $1 million to $10 million, and the class of equity security holders of record threshold from 500-750 to 1,000 persons.

Declares that, with respect to such registration requirement, the definition of "held of record" does not include securities held by persons who received them pursuant to an employee compensation plan in transactions exempted from specified registration requirements of the Securities Act of 1933 (exempt transactions). (Thus exempts securities held by such persons from registration requirements.)

Directs the SEC to: (1) revise the definition of "held of record" in accordance with this Act, and (2) adopt safe harbor provisions issuers can follow when determining that holders of their securities received them pursuant to an employee compensation plan in an exempt transaction.