Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/14/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/16/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 06/22/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 06/22/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 06/23/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 07/12/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/12/2011