Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 01/17/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/17/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/17/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/17/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 01/18/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 01/18/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/18/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/23/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/24/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/24/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/25/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 01/31/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/01/2012
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/13/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/13/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/16/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 02/24/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/24/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/24/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/27/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 02/29/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 02/29/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/05/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/05/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/06/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/06/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/08/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 03/08/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/21/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/21/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/21/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/26/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/16/2012