Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 06/15/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/06/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/07/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/08/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/12/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/15/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/20/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/21/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/26/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 07/28/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/23/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 10/03/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/12/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 10/13/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/25/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 10/25/2011
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 10/25/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/31/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/10/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/10/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/10/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/16/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 11/16/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 11/30/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 12/02/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/13/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/15/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 12/19/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/19/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 02/02/2012
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/07/2012
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/15/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/29/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/05/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/17/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/17/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/17/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 04/24/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/27/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/07/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/08/2012