Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/21/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/06/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/06/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/06/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/18/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/18/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/18/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/29/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/29/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/26/2012