Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/22/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/07/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/11/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/13/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/28/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/19/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/08/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/08/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/24/2012