Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/15/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/21/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/22/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/24/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/24/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/07/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/07/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/07/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/14/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 08/26/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/09/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/02/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/06/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/16/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/23/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/28/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/06/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/08/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/30/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/06/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/06/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/18/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/19/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/27/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/10/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/10/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/23/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 08/02/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/10/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/10/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/14/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/19/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/19/2012