Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/07/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/15/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/15/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/22/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/29/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/29/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 08/05/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 08/26/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 08/26/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 08/26/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/09/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/09/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/09/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/13/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/22/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/04/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/04/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/04/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 10/06/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/24/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/02/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 11/04/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/23/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/28/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/28/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/07/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/28/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/27/2012