There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to increase the alternative tax liability limitation for small property and casualty insurance companies.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/15/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
06/15/2011Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/15/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/22/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/06/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/06/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/07/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/08/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/11/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 07/12/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/15/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/15/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/20/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/26/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/26/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 07/26/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 08/01/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/07/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/07/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/09/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/03/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/25/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 12/02/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 12/12/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 12/14/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 12/20/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 12/20/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 04/27/2012
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/08/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/09/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/15/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 05/31/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/06/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/06/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/06/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/06/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/06/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/27/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 06/27/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/18/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/18/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/25/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 08/01/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 08/02/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/19/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 09/19/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means06/15/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2198. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/15/2011)

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to expand the eligibility of certain small insurance companies (other than life insurance companies) for the alternative corporate income tax by increasing the premium limitation used to determine such eligibility to $2.025 million (from $1.2 million), with an annual inflation adjustment after 2012.