Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/22/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/06/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/06/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/07/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/08/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/11/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 07/12/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/15/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/15/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/20/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/26/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/26/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 07/26/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 08/01/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/07/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/07/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/09/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/03/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/25/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 12/02/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 12/12/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 12/14/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 12/20/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 12/20/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 04/27/2012
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/08/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/09/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/15/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 05/31/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/06/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/06/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/06/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/06/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/06/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/27/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 06/27/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/18/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/18/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/25/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 08/01/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 08/02/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/19/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 09/19/2012