Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/08/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/08/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/08/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/08/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/08/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/19/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/19/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/19/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/23/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/23/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/23/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/06/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/26/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/26/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 01/17/2012