There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 801 West Eastport Street in Iuka, Mississippi, as the "Sergeant Jason W. Vaughn Post Office".


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
05/15/2012Became Public Law No: 112-110. (TXT | PDF)
05/15/2012Signed by President.
05/08/2012Presented to President.
04/26/2012Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2885)
04/25/2012Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
07/29/2011Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 420 - 0 (Roll no. 678).(text: CR 7/28/2011 H5723)
06/16/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/15/2012Became Public Law No: 112-110. (TXT | PDF)
05/15/2012Signed by President.
05/08/2012HousePresented to President.
04/27/2012SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/26/2012SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2885)
04/25/2012SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 374.
04/25/2012SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
04/25/2012SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
08/18/2011SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
07/29/2011SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
07/29/2011-6:38pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/29/2011-6:38pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 420 - 0 (Roll no. 678). (text: CR 7/28/2011 H5723)
07/29/2011-6:25pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5766-5767)
07/28/2011-6:07pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Lankford objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
07/28/2011-6:00pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2213.
07/28/2011-6:00pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5723-5724)
07/28/2011-6:00pmHouseMr. Lankford moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/22/2011HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
06/22/2011HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
06/22/2011HouseCommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
06/16/2011HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
06/16/2011HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 06/16/2011

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Government Reform06/16/2011 Referred to
06/22/2011 Hearings by
06/22/2011 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs07/29/2011 Referred to
04/25/2012 Markup by
04/25/2012 Reported by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security08/18/2011 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2213.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2213. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-110 (05/15/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 801 West Eastport Street in Iuka, Mississippi, as the "Sergeant Jason W. Vaughn Post Office."