Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/22/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 07/07/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 07/07/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/07/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/07/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 07/11/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/21/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/22/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/22/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/22/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/22/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/22/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/22/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 07/22/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 07/22/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 07/22/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/22/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 07/22/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/26/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/26/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/26/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 07/26/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/26/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 07/26/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/26/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 07/26/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/26/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 07/26/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/26/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/26/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 07/26/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/26/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 07/28/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/28/2011
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 07/28/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/29/2011
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 07/29/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/29/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 07/29/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/29/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 07/29/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 08/09/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 10/25/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 10/25/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 10/25/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/25/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 10/25/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 10/25/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 10/27/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/27/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 10/27/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/27/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 10/27/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/27/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/27/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 10/27/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 10/27/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 10/27/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 10/27/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 11/01/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 11/01/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 11/01/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 11/01/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 11/01/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 11/03/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 11/03/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 11/03/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 11/03/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 11/03/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/03/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/03/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/04/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/04/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 11/04/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 11/04/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 11/04/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 11/04/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 11/04/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/04/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 11/04/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 11/04/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 11/04/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 11/04/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 11/04/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 11/04/2011
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 11/04/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 11/04/2011
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 11/04/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 11/04/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 11/04/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/04/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 11/04/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 11/04/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 11/04/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 11/04/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/16/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/16/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 11/16/2011
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8] 11/16/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 11/16/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 11/16/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/16/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/16/2011