Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/21/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/21/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/21/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 06/21/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/21/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/21/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/21/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/21/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/21/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 06/22/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/12/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/14/2011