Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 06/16/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/08/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/21/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/22/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/26/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 08/26/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/09/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/23/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/06/2011
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 10/06/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 11/04/2011