Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/05/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/05/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/05/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/05/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/05/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/05/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/05/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/05/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/05/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/05/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/05/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/05/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/05/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/05/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/05/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/15/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/15/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/02/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/01/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/01/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 02/01/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/01/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/01/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/01/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/01/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/01/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/28/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/28/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/28/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/28/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/28/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/28/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/28/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/28/2012