Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 06/16/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/21/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/21/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/21/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/21/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 06/22/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/06/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/06/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/06/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/06/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/06/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/06/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/12/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/12/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/12/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/15/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/15/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 07/18/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 07/20/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/21/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/22/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/14/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/06/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/24/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 10/24/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 01/06/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/12/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/12/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 06/21/2012