Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/07/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/07/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/13/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/19/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/19/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/20/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/21/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 08/05/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/07/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/07/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/07/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/12/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/14/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/14/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/14/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/15/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/15/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/22/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/22/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/22/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/22/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/22/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/03/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/03/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/03/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/03/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/03/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/05/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 10/05/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/05/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 10/06/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 10/06/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 10/13/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 10/13/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 10/14/2011
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 10/14/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/25/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/25/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/25/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/25/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/25/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/25/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/27/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/01/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 11/01/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 11/01/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/01/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/01/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/01/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 11/04/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 11/04/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/04/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/15/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/01/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 12/12/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/12/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/20/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/20/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 01/25/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/07/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/15/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/17/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/27/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/27/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/27/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 02/29/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/29/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 03/06/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/06/2012
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 03/07/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/08/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/26/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/26/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 03/26/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/26/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/26/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/28/2012
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/29/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/17/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/19/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/25/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/26/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/09/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/10/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/18/2012
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/25/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/25/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/30/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 05/30/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 05/31/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/31/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/23/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/14/2012