Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/21/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/06/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/06/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/06/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/11/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/15/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/19/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/25/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/28/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 08/30/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/21/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/21/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/03/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/05/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/06/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/18/2012