Limit your search

1-16 of 16
  • H.Amdt.836   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: House Committee on Rules (Offered 10/13/2011)
  • H.Amdt.834   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: House Committee on Energy and Commerce (Offered 10/13/2011)
    Latest Action: 10/13/11 Amendment in the nature of a substitute reported by the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
  • H.Amdt.833   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: Amendment sought to require the EPA Administrator to take into account the potential reductions in the number of illness-related absences from work due to respiratory or other illnesses when the EPA is setting compliance deadlines.
    Sponsor: Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] (Offered 10/12/2011)
    Latest Action: 10/13/11 On agreeing to the Cohen amendment (A014) Failed by recorded vote: 174 - 250 (Roll no. 787). (consideration: CR H6881-6882)
  • H.Amdt.832   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: Senate amendment added a new title at the end of the bill entitled "Trade Adjustment Assistance" and appears on page H6771 of the Congressional Record of October 11, 2011.
    Sponsor: Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] (Offered 10/11/2011)
    Latest Action: 10/11/11 On agreeing to the Jackson Lee (TX) amendment (A013) Failed by recorded vote: 156 - 262 (Roll no. 779).
  • H.Amdt.831   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: After section 1, insert the following section (and redesignate the subsequent sections, and conform internal cross-references, accordingly): SEC. 2. FINDING. The Congress finds that the American people are exposed to mercury from industrial sources addressed by the rules listed in section 2(b) of this Act through the consumption of fish containing mercury and every State in the Nation has issued at least one mercury advisory for fish consumption.
    Sponsor: Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] (Offered 10/11/2011)
    Latest Action: 10/11/11 On agreeing to the Welch amendment (A012) Failed by recorded vote: 169 - 249 (Roll no. 778).
  • H.Amdt.830   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: Amendment sought to insert provisions which allow for a shortening of the 5-year delay contained in the bill if the Administrator finds that more than 1,000 jobs have been created under the regulation.
    Sponsor: Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] (Offered 10/11/2011)
    Latest Action: 10/11/11 On agreeing to the Ellison amendment (A011) Failed by recorded vote: 154 - 261 (Roll no. 777).
  • H.Amdt.829   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: After section 1, insert the following section (and redesignate the subsequent sections, and conform internal cross-references, accordingly): SEC. 2. FINDING. The Congress finds that mercury released into the ambient air from industrial boilers and waste incinerators addressed by the rules listed in section 2(b) of this Act is a potent neurotoxin that can damage the development of an infant's brain.
    Sponsor: Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] (Offered 10/11/2011)
    Latest Action: 10/11/11 On agreeing to the Schakowsky amendment (A010) Failed by recorded vote: 169 - 249 (Roll no. 776).
  • H.Amdt.828   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: After section 1, insert the following section (and redesignate subsequent sections, and conform internal cross-references, accordingly): SEC. 2. FINDING. The Congress finds that, according to the Environmental Protection Agency's analysis of the impacts of the final rules specified in section 3(b)(1) and section (3)(b)(2) on employment, based on peer-reviewed literature, such rules would create 2,200 net additional jobs, not including the jobs created to manufacture and install equipment to reduce air pollution.
    Sponsor: Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] (Offered 10/11/2011)
    Latest Action: 10/11/11 On agreeing to the Edwards amendment (A009) Failed by recorded vote: 157 - 260 (Roll no. 775).
  • H.Amdt.827   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: At the end of the bill, add the following section: SEC. 6. PROTECTION FROM AVOIDABLE CASES OF CANCER. Notwithstanding any other provision of this Act, the Administrator shall not delay actions pursuant to the rules identified in section 2(b) of this Act to reduce emissions from waste incinerators or industrial boilers at chemical facilities, oil refineries, or large manufacturing facilities if such emissions are increasing the risk of cancer.
    Sponsor: Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] (Offered 10/11/2011)
    Latest Action: 10/11/11 On agreeing to the Markey amendment (A008) Failed by recorded vote: 166 - 252 (Roll no. 774).
  • H.Amdt.826   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: At the end of the bill, add the following section: SEC. 6. PROTECTION FROM RESPIRATORY AND CARDIOVASCULAR ILLNESS AND DEATH. Notwithstanding any other provision of this Act, the Administrator shall not delay actions pursuant to the rules identified in section 2(b) of this Act to reduce emissions from waste incinerators or industrial boilers at chemical facilities, oil refineries, or large manufacturing facilities if such emissions are causing respiratory and cardiovascular illnesses and deaths, including cases of heart attacks, asthma attacks, and bronchitis.
    Sponsor: Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] (Offered 10/11/2011)
    Latest Action: 10/11/11 On agreeing to the Connolly (VA) amendment (A007) Failed by recorded vote: 168 - 250 (Roll no. 773).
  • H.Amdt.825   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: At the end of the bill, add the following section: SEC. 6. COMPLIANCE WITH CUT-GO. If this Act authorizes the appropriation of funds to implement this Act and does not reduce an existing authorization of appropriations to offset that amount, then the provisions of this Act shall cease to be effective.
    Sponsor: Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] (Offered 10/11/2011)
    Latest Action: 10/11/11 On agreeing to the Waxman amendment (A006) Failed by recorded vote: 164 - 254 (Roll no. 772).
  • H.Amdt.824   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: Amendment sought to establish a date for compliance with standards and requirements in accordance with the Clean Air Act and allows the Administrator to provide an extension for such compliance up to one year, but in no case beyond the date that is 5 years after the effective date of such regulation.
    Sponsor: Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] (Offered 10/06/2011)
    Latest Action: 10/06/11 On agreeing to the Doyle amendment (A005) Failed by recorded vote: 147 - 251, 1 Present (Roll no. 770).
  • H.Amdt.823   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: Amendment sought to add a finding to the bill which illustrates the health benefits of EPA's mercury and air toxic cleanup standards for industrial boilers and incinerators.
    Sponsor: Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] (Offered 10/06/2011)
    Latest Action: 10/06/11 On agreeing to the Capps amendment (A004) Failed by recorded vote: 153 - 254 (Roll no. 769).
  • H.Amdt.822   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: Amendment sought to require that the current boiler rules and regulations must stay in effect for the ten metropolitan areas of the United States with the worst air quality.
    Sponsor: Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] (Offered 10/06/2011)
    Latest Action: 10/06/11 On agreeing to the Hahn amendment (A003) Failed by recorded vote: 151 - 255 (Roll no. 768).
  • H.Amdt.821   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: Amendment sought to add provisions which clarify that section 5 of the bill was intended to supplement and not supersede the Clean Air Act.
    Sponsor: Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] (Offered 10/06/2011)
    Latest Action: 10/06/11 On agreeing to the Rush amendment (A002) Failed by recorded vote: 156 - 242 (Roll no. 767).
  • H.Amdt.820   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: At the end of the bill, add the following section: SEC. 6. PROTECTION FOR INFANTS AND CHILDREN. Notwithstanding any other provision of this Act, the Administrator shall not delay actions pursuant to the rules identified in section 2(b) of this Act to reduce emissions from waste incinerators or industrial boilers at chemical facilities, oil refineries, or large manufacturing facilities if such emissions are harming brain development or causing learning disabilities in infants or children.
    Sponsor: Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] (Offered 10/06/2011)
    Latest Action: 10/06/11 On agreeing to the Waxman amendment (A001) Failed by recorded vote: 167 - 243 (Roll no. 766).